MA H3003 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require that government agencies make certain demographic data available to the public. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring equitable representation in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-31HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2023-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H572 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S2187 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2617
S465 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback