MA H30 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Accompanied H46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Accompanied H46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recommendations of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security letter of transmittal
Title
Recommendations of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security (letter of transmittal)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Accompanied H46 | |
2010-03-29 | Accompanied H45 | |
2010-03-29 | Accompanied H34 | |
2010-03-01 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4532 | |
2010-02-25 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4526 | |
2009-01-20 | Placed on file |
Same As/Similar To
H46 (Replaced by) 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4526 (Replaced by) 2010-04-26 - New draft substituted, see H4618
H4532 (Replaced by)
H34 (Replaced by) 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
H45 (Replaced by) 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
H4526 (Replaced by) 2010-04-26 - New draft substituted, see H4618
H4532 (Replaced by)
H34 (Replaced by) 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
H45 (Replaced by) 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H30 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7462&generalCourtId=2 |