MA H2983 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4675

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the sale or auction of surplus state motor vehicles to cities and towns. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the enhanced disposition of surplus motor vehicles owned by the commonwealth or authorities established by the state

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4675
2023-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback