MA H2977 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4321
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the operation of autonomous vehicles without active control or monitoring by a human operator. Transportation.
Title
Relative to autonomous vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4321 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4321 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H180 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H179 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2282 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2283 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
H180 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H179 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2282 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2283 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2977.pdf |