MA H2973 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the excise tax on alcoholic beverages. Revenue.
Title
Increasing the excise tax on alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5279 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1809 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2973 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2973.pdf |