MA H2969 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a local option tax credit for certain landlords. Revenue.
Title
Providing a local option incentivizing landlords to rent unsubsidized properties at below market rent (good landlord tax credit)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1795 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H1371 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1371 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2969 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2969.pdf |