MA H2969 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 367 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 367 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to principle-based reserving for life insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to principle-based reserving for life insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 367 of the Acts of 2018 |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-12-17 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
H3894 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2018
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H505 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2207 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3894 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2018
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H505 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2207 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2969 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2969.pdf |