MA H2959 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include licensed rehabilitation counselors in the definition of licensed mental health professionals. Financial Services.
Title
Improving access to rehabilitation counseling
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. William Straus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3878 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2959.pdf |