MA H2954 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4162

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to property taxes for 100% disabled veterans. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to property tax relief for 100% disabled veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-06HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4162
2023-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4162 (Replaced by) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1930 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2700 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1868 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback