MA H2940 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to buffer zones on land under the agricultural restriction program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to buffer zones on land under the agricultural restriction program
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2940.pdf |