MA H294 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the student entrepreneurial development and economic investment fund. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the student entrepreneurial development and economic investment fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4305 |
2015-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4305 (Replaced by) 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H294 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H294.pdf |