MA H2939 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the viability of farms and farming in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting the viability of farms in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] |
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2613 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3323 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3915
S1584 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3915
H3915 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3323 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3915
S1584 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3915
H3915 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2939 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2939.pdf |