MA H2938 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate expenditures for mortgages from the Community Preservation Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
To sustain community preservation revenue
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4058 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2938 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2938.pdf |