MA H2913 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4734
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend the Brownfields tax credit. Revenue.
Title
To extend the Brownfields tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4734 |
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H706 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4733
H299 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2628
H1613 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H302 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2628
H4734 (Replaced by) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H299 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2628
H1613 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H302 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2628
H4734 (Replaced by) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2913 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2913.pdf |