MA H2910 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recycling in public buildings. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to public space recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied S436 |
2017-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S416 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S421 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1129 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3394 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3898 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2018
S436 (Replaced by) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S421 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1129 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3394 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3898 (Similar To) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2018
S436 (Replaced by) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2910 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2910.pdf |