MA H291 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the ways agencies of the Commonwealth can expand the availability of business district parking within urban areas. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to municipal parking
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4305 |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4305 (Replaced by) 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2141 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1720 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H3019 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1980 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2141 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1720 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H3019 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1980 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H291 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H291.pdf |