MA H2900 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to municipal ratepayers, low-income ratepayers, community solar ratepayers, and owners of small-scale solar projects. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to monthly minimum reliability contributions
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Meschino [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S506 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1988 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H861 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2864 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
S1988 (Similar To) 2020-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H861 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2864 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2900 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2900.pdf |