MA H2897 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4252

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to ranking candidates for office in order of preference in local elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4252
2017-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H351 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S372 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H374 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S393 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4046 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2018
H4252 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Reported, in part, by H3140

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback