MA H2896 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to publications provided by the State Ethics Commission to county and municipal employees concerning conduct of public officials and employees. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the distribution of the conflict of interest law
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2014 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2896 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2896.pdf |