MA H2896 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to removing employees with certain health coverage from the calculation of an employer’s fair share contribution, so called, and eliminating the collection of certain employer health care information by the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Health.
Title
To provide immediate relief to small businesses on health care costs
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4476 |
2011-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4476 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2896 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14384&generalCourtId=1 |