MA H2895 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting long-term renewable energy contracts for municipal aggregators and municipalities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To promote long-term renewable contracts for municipal aggregators and municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2782 (Similar To) 2016-09-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2016
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2895.pdf |