MA H2895 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a state health service corps within the Executive Office of Health and Human Services to ensure the quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care throughout the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
To ensure quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care, to eliminate health disparities, and to enhance economic growth throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4476 |
2011-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4476 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2895 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13637&generalCourtId=1 |