MA H2891 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reducing heating costs and greenhouse gas emissions, and promoting energy efficient heating systems in certain residential buildings. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To establish a home heating commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2891 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2891.pdf |