MA H2889 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the Norfolk County Commissioners to borrow money for the repair, renovation and constructing, equipping and furnishing of buildings at Norfolk County Agricultural High School in the town of Walpole. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Norfolk County Commissioners to borrow money for the repair, renovation and constructing, equipping and furnishing of buildings at Norfolk County Agricultural High School in the town of Walpole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4447 |
2012-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4447 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2889 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14161&generalCourtId=1 |