MA H2884 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy storage. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to promoting energy storage in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H841 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H612 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H473 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1183 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1396 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4924
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H841 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H612 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H473 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1183 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1396 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4924
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2884 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2884.pdf |