MA H2871 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the improved use of school-level data to inform effective resource allocation decisions at the local level. Education.
Title
Relative to effective resource allocation in schools
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | New draft substituted, see H4730 |
2018-07-10 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-10 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4730 |
2018-07-10 | House | Order adopted, see H4726 |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-29 | House | Accompanied by H2044 |
2017-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H312 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2044 (Replaces) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied H2871
H4726 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4730 (Replaced by) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4741
H4741 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz-DiDomenico-O'Connor), in concurrence
H2044 (Replaces) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied H2871
H4726 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4730 (Replaced by) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4741
H4741 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz-DiDomenico-O'Connor), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2871.pdf |