MA H2869 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4177
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the timing of contractual reimbursements for the federal manufacturer’s excise tax on petroleum products. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the timing of reimbursement for federal manufacturers excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4177 |
2015-11-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4177 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2976 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H2976 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2869 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2869.pdf |