MA H2869 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Belmont for recreation, public works or other municipal purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Belmont for recreation, public works or other municipal purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-01-16 | House | Enacted |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-10-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-25 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means adopted) and ordered to the third reading |
2013-09-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-09-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment previously recommended pending |
2013-09-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2013-07-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2869 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2869.pdf |