MA H2850 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to national fingerprint-based criminal background checks for certifying and recertifying certain school employees. Education.
Title
Relating to national fingerprint checks for school employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4632 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1364 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H841 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H841 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2850.pdf |