MA H2848 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt purchases of photography services by public schools from the Uniform Procurement Act. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Increasing competition among school photographers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2014-01-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2848 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2848.pdf |