MA H2829 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises in certain establishments. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2095 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H152 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1560 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1990 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2095 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H152 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1560 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1990 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2829 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2829.pdf |