MA H2821 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4725

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to conduct a comprehensive study relative to generating revenue from digital advertising. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish a digital advertising revenue commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-17HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4725
2023-09-06JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2787 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
H2930 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1846 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2966 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H4725 (Replaced by) 2024-06-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback