MA H2816 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to alcoholic beverage manufacturers' licenses for the sale of malt beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to alcoholic beverage manufacturer pouring licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2816 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2816.pdf |