MA H2812 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clarifying authority and responsibilities of the Department of Public Utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Clarifying authority and responsibilities of the department of public utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1975 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1975 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2812 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2812.pdf |