MA H2806 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include police officers of the University of Massachusetts in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement of University of Massachusetts police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2806.pdf |