MA H2805 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an independent office of quality assurance for mentally disabled persons. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing an independent office of quality assurance for developmentally disabled persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1500 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H971 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1500 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H971 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2805.pdf |