MA H2804 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of electric and gas energy efficiency funds allocated for low income residential customers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H2889 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1638 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1983 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1942 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1937 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1305 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H2889 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1638 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1983 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1942 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1937 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1305 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2804 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2804.pdf |