MA H2801 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Gardner be authorized to exchange certain parcels of land located in said city with the Department of Conservation and Recreation for conservation and recreation purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Gardner Heritage State Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3688 |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S946 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1589
H1589 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
H3688 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - New draft substituted, see H4911
H1589 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3191 (Similar To) 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2020
H3688 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - New draft substituted, see H4911
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2801 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2801.pdf |