MA H280 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish plumbing code regulations that provide building owners with guidelines for reusing greywater for toilet flushing and subsurface irrigation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to greywater recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H317 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H2113 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1395 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2113 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1395 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H280.pdf |