MA H28 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide sustainable water resources in the town of Tyngsborough. Environment and Natural Resources. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide sustainable water resources in the town of Tyngsborough

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-05-20HouseRules suspended
2024-05-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-04-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-03-18SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-19JointHearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

H2052 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2024

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback