MA H2780 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lakeville be authorized to establish a department of inspectional services and permitting for said town . Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the department of inspectional services and permitting in the town of Lakeville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-09-27 | House | Enacted |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A2 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3786 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2780.pdf |