MA H2779 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1657
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-29 - Accompanied S1657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-29 - Accompanied S1657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the song “Roadrunner” as the official rock song of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating the song “Roadrunner” as the official rock song of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-29 | Senate | Accompanied S1657 |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1657 (Replaced by) 2015-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2779.pdf |