MA H2775 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the sale or auction of surplus state motor vehicles to cities and towns. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the enhanced disposition of surplus motor vehicles owned by the commonwealth or authorities established by the state
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-01-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2775 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2775.pdf |