MA H2771 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Board of Higher Education to offer and administer free online public higher education courses to veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the education of the veterans of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4591 |
2017-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/17 from 2:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 & B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4591 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2771 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2771.pdf |