MA H2752 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Philips of Sharon, a petition of Edward R. Philips and Paul R. Feeney that the State Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to James Wright, an employee of the town of Sharon. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to James Wright
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2666 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
H3853 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4266 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3853 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4266 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2752 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2752.pdf |