MA H2739 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee on Public Counsel Services. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee for Public Counsel Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-06-16JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1745 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback