MA H2739 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating the Massachusetts Hospital School as the Pappas Rehabilitation Hospital for Children. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating the Massachusetts Hospital School as the Pappas Rehabilitation Hospital for Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-04-21 | House | Enacted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2739 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2739.pdf |