MA H2732 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1719
Note: Legislation replaced by H4338
Note: Legislation replaced by H4338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - New draft substituted, see H4338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - New draft substituted, see H4338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve the practice of including annual payments in lieu of vacation as regular compensation for current retirees and active retirement system members where such benefit existed as of May 2018. Public Service.
Title
To preserve the practice of including annual payments in lieu of vacation as regular compensation for current retirees and active retirement system members where such benefit existed as of May 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | House | New draft substituted, see H4338 |
2022-01-18 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-01-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-01-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4338 |
2021-12-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-16 | House | Accompanied by S1719 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1719 (Replaces) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
H4338 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2022
H4338 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2732 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2732.pdf |