MA H2725 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4502
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the definition, testing regulations and enforcement of motorcycle sound emissions. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the clarification for the definition, testing regulations, and enforcement of motorcycle sound emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4502 |
2017-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/17 from 3:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1917 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1862 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1922 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1917 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1862 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1922 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2725 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2725.pdf |