MA H2720 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4720
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the estate tax code of the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts estate tax code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4720 |
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4720 (Replaced by) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3667 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
S1857 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3667 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
S1857 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2720.pdf |